Fownes, Douglas Robert (CPSO#: 24800)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2007