Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fox, George Alexander (CPSO#: 57679)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1996