Fox, Gordon Stanley (CPSO#: 17891)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2015