Fox, Joanne Marie (CPSO#: 54205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: Homonylo, Joanne Marie (used until: 10 May 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
540 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6K 3P1
Phone: (905) 845-1544
Fax: (905) 845-2024
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne M. Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fox ( CPSO# 54205 )

Business Address:
540 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6K 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-1544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE MARIE FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2004