Fox, Jodi Vanessa (CPSO#: 86687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 May 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Mullica Hill NJ  08062
United States
Phone: 856 223 0965

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 May 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2009 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Jodi   Vanessa   Fox   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            Endocrinology, only.