Fox, Ricky (CPSO#: 51640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2489 Bloor Street West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Phone: (416) 767-3171
Fax: (416) 766-6896
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fox ( CPSO# 51640 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2489 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 767-3171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICKY FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1987