Fraboni, Theresa Lynn (CPSO#: 62228)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2000