Fralick, Richard Arthur (CPSO#: 25719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804176
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ARTHUR FRALICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRALICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1982