Francis, Amira Helmy (CPSO#: 81944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 15
5731 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y9
Phone: (905) 264-8082
Fax: 855-750-8833
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

110 brickyard way# 6
brampton
on
Brampton ON  L6V 4N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 457-1666
Fax: (905) 457-4666
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRA HELMY FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2006