Francis, Christopher John (CPSO#: 59627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-6200
Fax: (807) 346-6244
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. J. Francis Medicine - Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Francis ( CPSO# 59627 )

Business Address:
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-6200

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989