Francis, Gregory James (CPSO#: 71385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Center
Department of Emergency Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-1000
Fax: (807) 343-9047
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. M. Twiddy ( CPSO# 95507 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: Gregory J. Francis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JAMES FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999