Francis, Julie Margaret (CPSO#: 88502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 478-7444
Fax: (705) 478-8884
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie M. Francis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Francis ( CPSO# 88502 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 475-7444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE MARGARET FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013