Francis, Michael Lee (CPSO#: 56013)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain medical records may write to the following address: 260 Mississauga Street West Orillia, ON L3V 3B8
Date Received: 05 Jan 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 13 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Nov 2010
Summary:

On November 17, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Francis committed professional 
misconduct in that: 
 
Dr. Francis failed to comply with a term, condition and limitation on his certificate of 
registration, that was ordered by the Discipline Committee at a previous hearing, to "maintain a 
fax machine that is turned on and ready to receive faxes..."; and 
 
Dr. Francis engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional, by returning to Canada Post unopened envelopes received by Dr. Francis from a 
radiology clinic containing test results ordered by Dr. Francis for his patients; failing to ensure 
that his patients understood they could go to a pharmacist of their own choosing; continuing to 
keep a dog in his office despite having received two previous cautions from the College about the 
inappropriateness of doing so; continuing to charge inappropriate fees to patients despite having 
received a caution from the College about this issue; and communicating in a rude and 
unprofessional manner with a patient. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Francis' certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
      months, effective immediately. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Francis' Certificate of Registration: 
 
      a)    Dr. Francis will make reasonable efforts to repay to patients any archival fee; 
 
      b)    Dr. Francis will post a sign in his office which says he will repay any archival fee 
            if the patient has a receipt confirming payment; 
 
      c)    Dr. Francis will not be permitted to have a dog in his medical office at any time 
            when patients are present in the office; 
 
      d)    Dr. Francis will have an additional dedicated fax line which is turned on and ready 
            to receive all faxes, unless he is away on vacation; 
 
      e)    Dr. Francis will contact the College immediately to arrange, at his own expense, 
            to attend an educational program in Medical Ethics and Informed Consent, 
            approved by the College, at the earliest available opportunity; 
 
      f)    Dr. Francis will contact the College immediately to arrange, at his own expense, 
            to attend an educational program in Communications, approved by the College, at 
            the earliest available opportunity; 
 
      g)    Dr. Francis will successfully complete the educational programs specified in 
            paragraphs 3(e) and (f) above; 
 
       
 
      h)    Dr. Francis will see a practice mentor/coach, acceptable to the College at least 
            three times a year for one year at his own expense.  This practice mentor/coach 
            will report to the College by March 17, 2011, July 17, 2011, and November 17, 
            2011, advising the College whether Dr. Francis has seen him and when; and 
 
      i)    For a period of one year at his own expense, Dr. Francis will be subject to a 
            College approved Practice Monitor, who will be a member of a regulated health 
            profession and who will make unannounced visits to his office to ensure 
            compliance with all terms, conditions and limitations imposed upon his certificate 
            of registration.  This Practice Monitor shall make unannounced visits to Dr. 
            Francis' office 2-3 times a month during office hours and make quarterly reports 
            to the College, and/or report if there is a breach of any terms, conditions, and 
            limitations. 
 
3.    Dr. Francis pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00. 
 
4.    The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.   
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 17, 2010


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Feb 2007
Summary:

On February 26, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Michael Lee Francis committed acts of professional misconduct in that he 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional.   The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
 
1)    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Francis' certificate of 
registration for a period of one (1) month.   
 
2)    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to place the following terms and 
conditions on the certificate of registration of Dr. Michael Lee Francis: 
 
a.    Dr. Francis is required to successfully complete, at his own expense, the communications 
course approved by the College at the earliest available date and to provide proof that he has 
done so to the College; 
b.    Dr. Francis is required to maintain a fax machine that is turned on and ready to receive 
faxes, unless Dr. Francis is on vacation; 
c.    Dr. Francis is required to continue to use a prescription pad which is substantially similar 
to a copy attached to the original order (not attached);  
d.    Dr. Francis is required to respond to all faxed communications from pharmacists no later 
than the first day after receipt of the fax when Dr. Francis is back in the office; 
e.    Dr. Francis is required to make himself available, by telephone, on a timely basis to 
pharmacists to provide information required for patients in his practice; and 
f.    Dr. Francis is required to provide written or oral explanations to pharmacists practicing 
within his geographic area, detailing which drugs may be substituted and, when requested, Dr. 
Francis is required to provide his rationale in particular clinical areas to improve pharmacists' 
understanding of his prescribing patterns.  
 
3)    The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Francis to pay to the College costs in the amount of 
$2,500.00 within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order. 
 
 
Note: The suspension of Dr. Francis  certificate of registration takes effect March 13, 2007 at 
11:59 p.m. and terminates April 13, 2007 at 11:59 p.m. 
 
The terms, conditions and limitations imposed on Dr. Francis  certificate of registration take 
effect from February 26, 2007 at 11:59 p.m.     
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 26, 2007