Francis, Nicholas Andrew (CPSO#: 65124)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 2002