Francoeur, Maeve (CPSO#: 93243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Francoeur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAEVE FRANCOEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCOEUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2013