Franczyk, Juliet Agnes Elisabeth (CPSO#: 54085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Turnbull Diagnostic imaging
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2H7
Phone: (705) 742-3639
Fax: (705) 742-8389
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Franczyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Franczyk ( CPSO# 54085 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 743-6222

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2040

Business Address:
Medical Arts X-Ray
Suite 101
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H6
Phone Number: (705) 743-7810

Business Address:
Turnbull Diagnostic Imaging
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 742-3639

Business Address:
Pine Ridge X-Ray
555 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3S1
Phone Number: (705) 745-1058

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIET AGNES ELISABETH FRANCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCZYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986