Frank, Christopher Charles (CPSO#: 61095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53257
Fax: 6135485595
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-2473
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Frank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Frank ( CPSO# 61095 )

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHARLES FRANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1992 to 31 Jan 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991