Frank, Daniel Ellis (CPSO#: 28918)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 433 Cote St Catherine Road Montreal QC H3T 1E4
Date Received: 09 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017