Frank, Nathan P (CPSO#: 58401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7759 Ext. 4
Fax: (888)501-2202
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

OATC Kitchener Clinic
509 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 746-1919
Fax: (519) 746-1563
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

OATC Guelph Clinic
146 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 4E6
Canada
Phone: 519-822-6100
Fax: 519-822-6181
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nathan Frank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Frank ( CPSO# 58401 )

Business Address:
100 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN P FRANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1989