Franke, Norman Anthony (CPSO#: 62429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Med Oncology and Hematology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5663
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN ANTHONY FRANKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1991