Franklin, Alexander (CPSO#: 23701)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Russian

Education:University of London, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Mar 2010

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Franklin's professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Franklin failed to meet the standard of the profession and is incompetent in his care and treatment of 25 patients and of Patient "A".

Hearing Status: Adjourned

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2007
Summary:

On December 12, 2007 Dr. Alexander Franklin appealed the decision of the Discipline 
Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court).  Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the 
Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending 
the outcome of the appeal.   On January 7, 2009, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal for 
delay.  In February 2009, Dr. Franklin made a motion to the Divisional Court to continue with 
his appeal.   The decision of the Discipline Committee is on hold pending the outcome of the 
motion. On June 11, 2009, the Divisional Court dismissed for delay, on consent, Dr. Franklin s 
appeal.   Therefore, the following finding and penalty order are in effect. 
 
On July 19, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Franklin to have committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to meet the standard of the profession. 
 
On December 6, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Franklin s certificate of registration for a period of four (4) 
      months commencing one (1) week after the date of this Order.  Two (2) months of the 
      suspension shall be suspended on the condition that: 
 
      a)    Dr. Franklin successfully completes, at his own expense, the College s Medical 
            Record-Keeping for Physicians  course, at the earliest available date, and provides 
            proof that he has done so to the College. 
 
      b)    Two (2) months after the suspension commences, the remaining two months of 
            the suspension will be held in abeyance until one (1) week after the date of 
            completion of the next available College Medical Record-Keeping Course for 
            Physicians . If Dr. Franklin submits proof of satisfactorily completing the course 
            to the College within one (1) week of the course completion date, the balance of 
            the suspension will be suspended. Should he fail to submit that proof within that 
            one (1) week, the remainder of the two (2) months of the suspension will 
            commence immediately on the date that is one (1) week after the course 
            completion date. 
 
 2.   The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Franklin s 
      certificate of registration as of the date of this Order: 
 
      a)     That Dr. Franklin participate in a preceptorship, at his own expense, with a 
            preceptor who is acceptable to the College, for a minimum period of one week, or 
            until the preceptor determines that Dr. Franklin meets the standard of care 
            expected of the general practitioner limited to eye examinations. The preceptor 
            will sign an undertaking with the College in this matter and will report to the 
            College after one (1) week, as to Dr. Franklin s capabilities with reference to eye 
            examinations and, if he/she deems it necessary, on a monthly basis until such time 
            as he/she deems Dr. Franklin capable to perform eye examinations to the standard 
            of a general practitioner limited to eye examinations. The preceptorship will 
            commence, if Dr. Franklin meets the conditions in paragraph 1 of this Order, 
            immediately after the balance of the suspension is suspended. If Dr. Franklin fails 
            to meet the conditions in paragraph 1 of this Order, the preceptorship will 
            commence immediately following the completion in full of the full four (4) 
            months suspension. 
      b)    That Dr. Franklin undergo, at his own expense, a re-inspection of his practice by a 
            physician selected by the College, no sooner than three (3) months and no later 
            than six (6) months after the end of his preceptorship.   The inspector shall report 
            his findings to the College. 
 
  
 
      c)    That Dr. Franklin shall abide by any recommendations of the inspector with 
            reference to his practice.  This could include the need for a further re-inspection, 
            at Dr. Franklin s expense, should the inspector deem it necessary. This 
            re-inspection would occur within six (6) months of the initial re-inspection. 
 
 3.    Dr. Franklin is required to attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be 
      fixed by the panel of the Discipline Committee of the College, but no later than three (3) 
      months from the date this Order becomes final. 
 
4.     Dr. Franklin pay costs to the College in the amount of $21,625.00 within 90 days of the 
      date of this Order. 
 
5.    The results of this proceeding be included on the register. 
 
  
 
 
 
 
 
  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 11 Jun 2009
Hearing Date(s): Jul 19, 2007