Franklyn, Michael Thomas (CPSO#: 63638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brady Clinic
359 Riverside Drive
Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone: (705) 688-8833
Fax: (705) 688-8646
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Franklyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Franklyn ( CPSO# 63638 )

Business Address:
Brady Clinic
101 - 359 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone Number: (705) 688-8833

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL THOMAS FRANKLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANKLYN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992