Franko, George (CPSO#: 21872)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 505 5958 Iona Drive Vancouver BC V6T 2L2
Date Received: 14 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015