Frantseva, Marina (CPSO#: 83334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMHA
201-15150 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G1M2
Phone: 905 8413977 Ext. 3221
Fax: 9058413007
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

344 Edgely Blvd
Vaughan ON  L4K3Y9
Canada
Fax: 9058413007
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marina Frantseva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Frantseva ( CPSO# 83334 )

Business Address:
CAMH Queen's Site
Department of Psychiatry
1001 Queen Street West
Suite 2-179
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
15150 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M2
Phone Number: (905) 841-3977

Business Address:
27 - 344 Edgeley Boulevard
Vaughan ON  L4K 4B7
Phone Number: (416) 910-5226

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA FRANTSEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANTSEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010