Frasca, Erika Jocelyn (CPSO#: 95636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 960-1366
Fax: (416) 960-1945
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erika Frasca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Frasca ( CPSO# 95636 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 585-9555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIKA JOCELYN FRASCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASCA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013