Fraser, Ashley Rhona (CPSO#: 103781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 1st Ave West, Suite 2000
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY RHONA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016