Fraser, Candace Lynne (CPSO#: 55590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: Jones, Candace Lynne (used until: 28 Apr 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Colchester Family Practice
883 Blakely Road
Colchester VT  05446
United States
Phone: (802) 847-2055
Fax: (802) 847-1688

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CANDACE LYNNE FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987