Fraser, David Martin (CPSO#: 56038)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1986
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: July 23, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from July 23, 2007, Dr. David Martin Fraser undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that he has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.