Fraser, Douglas Bruce (CPSO#: 27587)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2007