Fraser, Douglas Dale (CPSO#: 72361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Critical Care Medicine
Room C2-C82
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8052
Fax: (519) 685-8766
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas D. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fraser ( CPSO# 72361 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital
Paediatric Critical Care Medicine
Room C2-C82
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8052

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS DALE FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002