Fraser, Gordon Andrew Donald (CPSO#: 69105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
83 Dawson Road
Suite 210
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 821-2441
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.A.D. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fraser ( CPSO# 69105 )

Business Address:
210 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 821-2463

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON ANDREW DONALD FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000