Fraser, Ian Murray (CPSO#: 33484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian M. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fraser ( CPSO# 33484 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Respiratory Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN MURRAY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982