Fraser, James Murray (CPSO#: 57727)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 1987 to 30 Jun 1987
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Aug 1988
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994