Fraser, Kristin Linnea (CPSO#: 65389)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 2000