Fraser, Louis Harvey (CPSO#: 70590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alberta Health Services
South Health Campus
4448 Front Street Southeast
Calgary AB  T3M 1M4
Phone: (403) 956-3900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS HARVEY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017