Fraser, Nancy Lynn (CPSO#: 50590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fraser ( CPSO# 50590 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-1065

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY LYNN FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007