Frayha, Husn Habib (CPSO#: 52353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Faisal Specialist Hospital &
Research Centre, MBC- 58
P O Box 3354
Riyadh 11211
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 9661-4427761
Fax: 9661 4427784

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Lebanon
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSN HABIB FRAYHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRAYHA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985