Frechette, Robert (CPSO#: 30242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2855 Front Road
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 2R2
Phone: (613) 632-4711
Fax: (613) 632-9459
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prescott Russell Nursing Home
1020 Boulv Cartier
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-2755
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Residence Champlain
428 Front Road West
L'orignal ON  K0B 1K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 675-4617
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]

            UNDERTAKING # 1 of 2

            As from November 2, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Frechette, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Frechette to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. ROBERT FRECHETTE
                                           ("Dr. Frechette")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Frechette, certificate of registration number 30242, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of
                  monitoring by the College with respect to my clinical practice. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Supervisor"),
                        for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that I have reviewed the
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Supervisor(s), including, at
                        minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitating the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  A review of at least ten (10) of my patient charts per visit
                              to my practice by the Supervisor, which shall be selected by
                              the Supervisor(s);
                  
                        (iii) Meeting with me at least once every month for the first two
                              (2) months, and thereafter once every two (2) months for two
                              (2) visits, and thereafter, if approved by the College, once
                              every three months, to discuss any concerns arising from the
                              chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Making recommendations to me for practice improvements;
                  
                        (v)   Submitting written reports to the College after each
                              meeting/office visit, or more frequently if the Supervisor(s)
                              has concerns about my standard of practice; and
                  
                        (vi)  Making recommendations to me for ongoing professional
                              development.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        College's medical assessor dated June 27, 2014, July 23, 2014, and
                        an undated report received by the College on March 24, 2015 (the
                        "Reports"), and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        supervision of my practice, conducted under this term of the
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Supervisor(s), including but not limited to,
                        any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional
                        development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Frechette, agree that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Supervisor(s) on the terms set out under subparagraphs B(4)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Supervisor(s) acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Frechette, agree that if I am required to cease practice as
                        a result of subparagraph B(4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to, under the guidance of my
                        Supervisor(s), participate in and successfully complete the
                        following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in subparagraph B(4)(b).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in subparagraph B(4)(b) as soon as possible.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the IEP set out in B(4)(b) above and
                        Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge and agree that my Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Frechette, understand and agree that if I am of the view
                        that any of the Assessor(s)' recommendations are unreasonable, I
                        will have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the
                        recommendations within which to provide the College with my
                        submissions in this regard.  I further understand and agree that
                        thereafter, the ICR Committee will consider my submissions and make
                        a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or
                        any of them, are reasonable and 
                        if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in subparagraph B(7)(d) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Frechette, hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of
                        Registration, for the purposes of Section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice and/or which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in subparagraph B(7)(d) as
                        limitations and restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                        not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the terms of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Frechette, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Frechette, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.



            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
            (10)  I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Frechette, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Frechette was the subject of monitoring by the College.  As a
                        result of the monitoring reports received:
                  
                              Dr. Frechette will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              Dr. Frechette's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six (6) months of the
                              completion of his Individualized Education Plan.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Frechette, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in paragraph B(4) above and to all Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Frechette, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practise or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Frechette, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education set out in
                  paragraph B(4) above, and to all Supervisors, Chief(s) of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Supervisor's undertaking set out at
                        Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at paragraph B(4) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
            UNDERTAKING #2 of 2

            Effective July 31, 2007, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Frechette, in
            accordance with an undertaking given by Dr. Frechette to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dispensing Agreement

                  4.1   I, DR. ROBERT FRECHETTE, undertake and agree that I shall no longer
                        dispense and/or sell medications, from my office or any other
                        practice, except to provide sample products when appropriate.
                  
                  4.2   I, DR. ROBERT FRECHETTE, confirm that I have disposed of all of my
                        in-stock medication, excluding sample medications, and have
                        provided written proof of same to the College and agree I will not
                        acquire more stock, excluding sample medications.
                  
                  
            Random Visits

                  5.1   I, DR. ROBERT FRECHETTE, give my irrevocable consent to and
                  undertakingto co-operate with random visits by College Investigator(s) in
                  regard to cleanliness and tidiness of my offices including storage areas.
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 2, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Frechette to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2015:

Dr. Frechette was the subject of monitoring by the College. As a result of the monitoring reports received:

Dr. Frechette will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

Dr. Frechette’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of his Individualized Education Plan.