Frederick, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
460 Springbank
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 672-3509
Fax: (519) 672-8621
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine E. Frederick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Frederick ( CPSO# 58172 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 672-3509

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH FREDERICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDERICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988