Frederiks, Ryan Pieter (CPSO#: 103460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: 9058767000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Frederiks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Frederiks ( CPSO# 103460)

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN PIETER FREDERIKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDERIKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016