Freedman, David Michael (CPSO#: 61029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W9
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: (905) 881-1721
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 215
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: (905) 472-6534
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Freedman ( CPSO# 61029 )

Business Address:
215 - 6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-7127

Business Address:
398 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 11-14
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W9
Phone Number: (905) 881-0334

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1991