Freedman, John Judah Lionel (CPSO#: 21940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto M5B 1W8
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5184
Fax: (416) 864-6063
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 01 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JUDAH LIONEL FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1976