Freedman, Paul Edward (CPSO#: 23615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100-101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-0117
Fax: (416) 787-8094
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Murray St 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-3175
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

#1500 333Bay St
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 364-3008
Fax: (416) 362-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Family Medicine Unit
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5157

Business Address:
1500 - 333 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Phone Number: (416) 364-3008

Business Address:
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suites 101
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-0117


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971