Freedman, Stephen Mendel (CPSO#: 67820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone: (905) 455-3010
Fax: (905) 455-3011
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Main Health Care
294 Main Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
Phone: 4166933030
Fax: 4166933033
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K1H8
Canada
Phone: 4162644848
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dufferin Multispecialty Clinic
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H3M1
Canada
Phone: 4166526101
Fax: 4166521994
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freedman Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 68754 )
Dr. S. Freedman ( CPSO# 67820 )

Business Address:
Brampton Cardiopulmonary Services
Unit 7
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 455-3010

Business Address:
Toronto Public Health
Sexual Health Clinic
2340 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Phone Number: (416) 392-0999

Business Address:
294 Main Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 652-6101

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MENDEL FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998