Freeland, Alison Diana (CPSO#: 62006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Clinical Administration Building
15 Bronte College Court
7th Floor, 7-52
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E7
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Ext. 3061
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison D. Freeland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freeland ( CPSO# 62006 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Clinical Administration Building
7th Floor, 7-52
15 Bronte College Court
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E7
Phone Number: (905) 848-7580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON DIANA FREELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREELAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1990