Freeman, Christie Lorian (CPSO#: 72757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Ferguson, Christie Lorian (used until: 05 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Dr
Suite LL03
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 775-0127
Fax: (705) 775-0134
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christie Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Freeman ( CPSO# 72757 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
LL03
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 775-0127

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIE LORIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000