Freeman, Gwenyth May (CPSO#: 52973)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003