Freeman, Jeffrey Michael (CPSO#: 53428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3825 Sunset Street
Burnaby BC  V5G 1T4
Phone: (604) 434-9515
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey M. Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Freeman ( CPSO# 53428 )

Business Address:
3825 Sunset Street
Burnaby BC  V5G 1T4
Phone Number: (604) 434-9515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MICHAEL FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2010