Freeman, Jeremy Louis (CPSO#: 30078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5141
Fax: 416 466 6580
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy L. Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Freeman ( CPSO# 30078 )

Business Address:
401 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY LOUIS FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978