Freeman, Joel Bernard (CPSO#: 29288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Feb 2008
Summary:

 On February 11, 2008 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Freeman committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered the following:

1.	The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Freeman to appear before 
 the Panel to be reprimanded.

2.	The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Freeman to pay costs to the 
 College in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order. 

3.	The Discipline 
 Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 1, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Joel Bernard Freeman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

I, Dr. Freeman:

• Hereby resign from the College effective June 1, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).

• Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.